Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 15:04:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MORING, ANTHONY LERONE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORING, ANTHONY LERONE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSELEY, MARK W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************26 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSELEY, MARK W

 

Party Details

Defendants

MORING, ANTHONY LERONE

Gainesville, FL 32609

MORING, ANTHONEY LERONE

Gainesville, FL 32609

MORING, ANTHONY KERIBE

Gainesville, FL 32609

MORING, ANTHONY L.

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

LONG, CAROLE

Gainesville, FL 32609

HINES, STEPHANIE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RAMSEY JR ESQ, JOHN A

537 Ne 1St Street, Suite 3

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HINES, STEPHANIE

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT COMPLETED 66.5 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

04/26/2019: DEFENDANT COMPLETED 66.5 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

DEFENDANT COMPLETED 60 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

02/07/2019: DEFENDANT COMPLETED 60 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

11/19/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

11/14/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

11/07/2018: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

10/31/2018: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

10/24/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

10/24/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

08/10/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

05/17/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/07/2018: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

05/07/2018: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

COURT ACTION MEMO

12/14/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

11/09/2017: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

COURT ACTION MEMO

11/08/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

COURT ACTION MEMO -RULE TO SHOW CAUSE DISMISSED PER STATE

08/31/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO -RULE TO SHOW CAUSE DISMISSED PER STATE

INFORMATION FILED

08/31/2017: INFORMATION FILED

ORDER DISMISSING RULE TO SHOW CAUSE // CARISSA MORING - 8/31/2017 AT 9AM // DAVIS

08/23/2017: ORDER DISMISSING RULE TO SHOW CAUSE // CARISSA MORING - 8/31/2017 AT 9AM // DAVIS

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT COMPLETED 90.5 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT COMPLETED 113 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT COMPLETED 66.5 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT COMPLETED 60 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//HAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • HearingJury Selection; Judge: MOSELEY, MARK W; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • ChargeBATTERY: 2ND OR SUBSQ OFFENSE; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: A302153764; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: RODNEY J. LONG BAIL BONDS AGY.; Insurance Company: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: A302153764 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: BATTERY: 2ND OR SUBSQ OFFENSE ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: BATTERY: 2ND OR SUBSQ OFFENSE ; Bonding Co.: RODNEY J. LONG BAIL BONDS AGY. ; Bond Amount: $20000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 11/19/2018 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 08/02/2017 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 08/02/2017 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: A302153764 ; Bond Amount: $20000 ; Bonding Co.: RODNEY J. LONG BAIL BONDS AGY. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: A302153764; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: RODNEY J. LONG BAIL BONDS AGY.; Insurance Company: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 08/02/2017 for: MORING, ANTHONY LERONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $1,023.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $1,023.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 07/10/2017 ; For: MORING, ANTHONY LERONE ; Bond Amt: 20000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less