This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 16:03:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MIHELIC, ALEXANDRIA MARIANA

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MIHELIC, ALEXANDRIA MARIANA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************86 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

MIHELIC, ALEXANDRIA MARIANA

Gainesville, FL 32607

MIHELIC, ALEXANDRIA M

MICHELIC, ALEXANDRIA MARIANA

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLINE, SHANNON MATHIS

Gainesville, FL 32627

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COUNSEL, REGIONAL

235 South Main St., Suite 205

Gainesville, FL 32601

RUPPERT ESQ, MICHAEL

500 E University Ave Ste E

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/08/2022: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/08/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

01/08/2022: ARREST FORM

SURETY BOND

01/10/2022: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/10/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

01/12/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

01/12/2022: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

01/12/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/14/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

01/20/2022: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

01/20/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

01/21/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/07/2022 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/09/2022 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2022AA007703 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2022
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: 2022AA007703; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID