Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:16:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCPHADDEN, THOMASINE

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCPHADDEN, THOMASINE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************98 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

MCPHADDEN, THOMASINE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

LONG, CAROLE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COPY OF RECEIPT

03/29/2021: COPY OF RECEIPT

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/23/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/22/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

03/19/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/18/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/18/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/18/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/18/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/18/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 223895; Paid: $50.00; Applied: $50.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/17/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/18/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021BB003042 ; Bond Amount: $10000 ; Bonding Co.: RODNEY J. LONG BAIL BONDS AGY. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Power Number: 2021BB003042; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: RODNEY J. LONG BAIL BONDS AGY.; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE Receipt: 223895 Date: 03/29/2021; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $50.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less