This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 16:02:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCLEES, KELLI AMBER

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCLEES, KELLI AMBER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************33 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCLEES, KELLI AMBER

Gainesville, FL 32605

BURNETT, KELLI

BURNETTE, KELLI AMBER

MCLEESE, KELLY AMBER

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/07/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/28/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • ChargeLARC: GRAND THEFT 750 LESS THAN 5K DOLS; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 01/12/2022; Final Decision Date: 01/12/2022; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID