Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:36:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCDOWALL, ROBERT JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCDOWALL, ROBERT JOHN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************21 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCDOWALL, ROBERT JOHN

Lake Butler, FL 32054

MCDOWELL, ROBERT JOHN

Lake Butler, FL 32054

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, INTAKE DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, INTAKE DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

EMAIL FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

03/22/2021: EMAIL FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/21/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/21/2021: ARREST FORM

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Bench Warrant Issued

02/25/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

02/25/2021: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

02/25/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 03/20/2021 for: MCDOWALL, ROBERT JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 02/25/2021 ; For: MCDOWALL, ROBERT JOHN ; Bond Amt: 60000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HECHAVARRIA, OMAR