This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 01:58:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCDANIEL, JESSICA LEIGH

Case Summary

On 04/28/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCDANIEL, JESSICA LEIGH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSELEY, MARK W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************38 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSELEY, MARK W

 

Party Details

Defendant

MCDANIEL, JESSICA LEIGH

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

WHITEWAY, JAMIE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WHITEWAY, JAMIE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

09/21/2018: CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

SCORE SHEET

09/13/2018: SCORE SHEET

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // DAVIS

09/13/2018: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // DAVIS

LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

09/13/2018: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//@

09/13/2018: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//@

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

09/13/2018: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

09/13/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/16/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

08/06/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/20/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/10/2018: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/06/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

INFORMATION FILED

05/25/2018: INFORMATION FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

05/11/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/08/2018: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

05/07/2018: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/07/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

05/01/2018: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $671.00 SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//JMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • HearingChange of Plea; Judge: MOSELEY, MARK W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • ChargeDRUG EQUIP-POSSESS: AND OR USE; Charge: 2; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • ChargeCOCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCORE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2018
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2018
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITEWAY, JAMIE