Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/13/2021 at 16:02:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCCULLOR, MARLON JERMAINE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCCULLOR, MARLON JERMAINE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************55 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCCULLOR, MARLON JERMAINE

Gainesville, FL 32601

SMITH, JOHN

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCULLOR, MARION J

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

CALHOUN, GARY

Gainesville, FL 32609

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/07/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/05/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

SURETY BOND

04/05/2021: SURETY BOND

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/31/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/31/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/31/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/31/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/30/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/02/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: AB21149408 ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; Bonding Co.: GARY CALHOUN BAIL BOND ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $15,000.00; Power Number: AB21149408; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: GARY CALHOUN BAIL BOND; Insurance Company: ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID