This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 12:01:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCCRAY, DEVONN RASHEEN

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCCRAY, DEVONN RASHEEN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************62 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

MCCRAY, DEVONN RASHEEN

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

Gainesville, FL 32602

BRYANT, ANDRAE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

RAMSEY ESQ, JOHN A

537 Ne 1 Street, Suite 3

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/29/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/29/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

04/22/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

SURETY BOND

04/12/2021: SURETY BOND

ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

04/08/2021: ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/08/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

04/02/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/02/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/02/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

04/02/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

04/02/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/01/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

03/30/2021: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/15/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/15/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/13/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/13/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ARREST FORM

03/13/2021: ARREST FORM

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 3; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Power Number: PSE151550702; Bond Status: Case Transfer; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Power Number: PSE25917626; Bond Status: Case Transfer; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: PSE151550702 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: TRESPASSING: FAIL TO LEAVE PROPERTY UPON ORDER BY ; Prosecutor Count #: 3 ; Prosecutor Action Code: TRESPASSING: FAIL TO LEAVE PROPERTY UPON ORDER BY ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $10000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 2 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Case Transfer ; New Bond Status Date Added: 05/13/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: PSE25917626 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: STALKING (DOMESTIC) ; Prosecutor Count #: 2 ; Prosecutor Action Code: STALKING (DOMESTIC) ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Case Transfer ; New Bond Status Date Added: 05/13/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • ChargeTRESPASSING: FAIL TO LEAVE PROPERTY UPON ORDER BY; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • ChargeSTALKING (DOMESTIC); Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • ChargeBURGL: OCCUPIED DWELLING UNARMED; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket-CONSOLIDATED INTO 012021CF1168A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2, 3; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/07/2021; Final Action: Consol Crim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOBTS POST-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2, 3; RE-ARREST PHASE; OBTS Number: 0108046086; Re-Arrest Date: 04/28/2021; Officer Agency: ALACHUA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Charge Code: FTA (No Bond)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less