This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 12/03/2020 at 15:06:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MCCLOUD JR, FLETCHER

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCCLOUD JR, FLETCHER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************57 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

MCCLOUD JR, FLETCHER

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

BECKER, MICHAEL L

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BECKER, MICHAEL L

Assistant State Attorney, 120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

12/01/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

11/23/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

11/23/2020: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

11/23/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

11/23/2020: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

11/23/2020: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

Bench Warrant Issued

11/20/2020: Bench Warrant Issued

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

11/20/2020: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

11/20/2020: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2020
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 11/22/2020 for: MCCLOUD JR, FLETCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 11/20/2020 ; For: MCCLOUD JR, FLETCHER ; Bond Amt: 710000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER MICHAEL L. LAW OFFICES OF