This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:46:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MATHIS, ANTHONY C

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MATHIS, ANTHONY C. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************87 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

MATHIS, ANTHONY C

Newberry, FL 32669

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

05/12/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/15/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

04/13/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/12/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/12/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • ChargeMARIJUANA-POSSESS: NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • ChargeCARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON: UNLICENSED FIREARM; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/12/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TENNEY, JOHN W