This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 09/01/2021 at 18:39:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MARKHAM, LARRY LEE

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARKHAM, LARRY LEE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************98 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendants

MARKHAM, LARRY LEE

Gainesville, FL 32641

MARKHAM, LARRY

Gainesville, FL 32641

MARKHAM, LARRY L.

Gainesville, FL 32641

MARKHAM, ROCK

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

RODGERS, BRIAN C

Gainesville, FL 32602

RUPPERT, MICHAEL T

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN, AUBRONCEE

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

BROLING, JOHN L

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

RODGERS, BRIAN C

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

HEARING NOTES

08/27/2021: HEARING NOTES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY TO REPRESENT WITNESS / MICHAEL T. RUPPERT // COLAW

08/10/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY TO REPRESENT WITNESS / MICHAEL T. RUPPERT // COLAW

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/06/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE -SPECIAL HEARING ON 09/13/2021

08/03/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE -SPECIAL HEARING ON 09/13/2021

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/03/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

08/02/2021: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

07/06/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING

06/08/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING

COURT ACTION MINUTES

06/08/2021: COURT ACTION MINUTES

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/08/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY // COLAW

06/07/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY // COLAW

MOTION

06/02/2021: MOTION

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

05/06/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/07/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

DEFENDANT / CONTEMNORS MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

05/06/2021: DEFENDANT / CONTEMNORS MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

05/05/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY TO REPRESENT WITNESS / MICHAEL T. RUPPERT // COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingVOP Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE -SPECIAL HEARING ON 09/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingVOP Case Management; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: VOP Hearing ; Date: 08/03/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT / CONTEMNORS MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE; REF: CASE 2019CF2096A STATE OF FLORIDA VS. KURTIZ MARCELLE MENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODGERS, BRIAN C