This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2022 at 04:07:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LOOPER, BAILEY CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LOOPER, BAILEY CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLAW, JAMES M and KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************47 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLAW, JAMES M

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

LOOPER, BAILEY CHRISTINA

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

WATSON, VICTORIA A

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PIERRE-ANTOINE ESQ, YVENS

305 Ne 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WATSON, VICTORIA A

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

RESTITUTION ORDER - RESTITUTION NOT ORDERED

02/08/2022: RESTITUTION ORDER - RESTITUTION NOT ORDERED

COURT ACTION MEMO

02/08/2022: COURT ACTION MEMO

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

02/03/2022: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

01/25/2022: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

SCORE SHEET

01/25/2022: SCORE SHEET

CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

01/25/2022: CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

CIVIL RESTITUTION ORDER - HEARING SET

01/25/2022: CIVIL RESTITUTION ORDER - HEARING SET

CIVIL RESTITUTION ORDER - HEARING SET

01/25/2022: CIVIL RESTITUTION ORDER - HEARING SET

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

01/25/2022: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

01/25/2022: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

01/25/2022: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS/PAY THROUGH PROBATION//COLAW

01/25/2022: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS/PAY THROUGH PROBATION//COLAW

ORDER OF DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION//COLAW

01/25/2022: ORDER OF DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION//COLAW

FELONY WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

01/25/2022: FELONY WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//COLAW

01/25/2022: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

01/25/2022: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION TO ADD CASE TO CHANGE OF PLEA DOCKET

01/24/2022: MOTION TO ADD CASE TO CHANGE OF PLEA DOCKET

ORDER TO ADD CASE TO PTC FOR CHANGE OF PLEA//COLAW

01/24/2022: ORDER TO ADD CASE TO PTC FOR CHANGE OF PLEA//COLAW

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingRestitution Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESTITUTION ORDER - RESTITUTION NOT ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//hap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingPre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargePETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE; Charge: 6; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargePETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE; Charge: 5; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE(012021CF3757A); Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, VICTORIA A