This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 09/25/2021 at 16:02:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LEWIS, KIRK ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEWIS, KIRK ANTHONY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************50 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEWIS, KIRK ANTHONY

Hawthorne, FL 32640

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/09/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/08/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

08/29/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

08/29/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

08/29/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less