This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 09/27/2021 at 16:00:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LEE, RASHEKA AMARI

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEE, RASHEKA AMARI. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************56 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEE, RASHEKA AMARI

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

RODGERS, ANGELA H

Gainesville, FL 32601

BAKER, TYRONE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Landsman, Matt D.

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RODGERS, ANGELA H

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/27/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

SURETY BOND

09/01/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

09/01/2021: SURETY BOND

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

08/31/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

08/31/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

08/31/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

08/31/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 08/30/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 08/31/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA033634 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 08/30/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 08/31/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA033633 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: 2021AA033634; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: 2021AA033633; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODGERS, ANGELA H