This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:32:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LEE JR, TRAVIS HENRY

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEE JR, TRAVIS HENRY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************92 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEE JR, TRAVIS HENRY

Starke, FL 32091

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE

08/04/2021: CORRESPONDENCE

PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION CONTRACT

05/27/2021: PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION CONTRACT

AFFIDAVIT OF ADMISSION TO OFFENSE(S) CHARGED

05/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF ADMISSION TO OFFENSE(S) CHARGED

COURT ACTION MEMO

05/27/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

04/12/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/11/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingDisposition; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: ON OFFICER FIREFIGHTER EMT ETC; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF STATE ATTY COST OF PROSECUTION; Amount: $200.00; Amount Due: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/27/2021; Final Action: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ADMISSION TO OFFENSE(S) CHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Disposition ; Date: 05/27/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $200.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, VICTORIA A