This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/09/2020 at 14:03:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LEDGER, HEATHER MARIE

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEDGER, HEATHER MARIE. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER-JONES, SUSAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************14 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER-JONES, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEDGER, HEATHER MARIE

High Springs, FL 32643

Not Yet Classified

HINES, STEPHANIE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HINES, STEPHANIE

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT; (CORRECT DOB VERIFIED THROUGH DMV)

11/14/2017: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT; (CORRECT DOB VERIFIED THROUGH DMV)

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

11/21/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

INFORMATION FILED

12/21/2017: INFORMATION FILED

Summons Issued (Do not delete)

12/21/2017: Summons Issued (Do not delete)

COPY OF INFORMATION SHOWING CASE NUMBER

12/21/2017: COPY OF INFORMATION SHOWING CASE NUMBER

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

12/27/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS

01/18/2018: RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS

COPY OF RECEIPT

02/15/2018: COPY OF RECEIPT

COURT ACTION MINUTES

02/15/2018: COURT ACTION MINUTES

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

02/15/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA AND WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL

02/15/2018: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA AND WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL

MISDEMEANOR WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

02/15/2018: MISDEMEANOR WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: MILLER-JONES, SUSAN; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • ChargePETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Withheld Adj.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 185957; Paid: $276.00; Applied: $276.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED// emj

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketOBTS COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; Charge Status: Same; Final Plea: Nolo Contendere 02/15/2018; Court Action: Withheld Adj. 02/15/2018; Disp. Judge: MILLER-JONES, SUSAN; Court Action: None - No Trial; Date Imposed: 02/15/2018; Effective Date/Time: 02/15/2018 ; Defr Sentence: No; Costs: 276.00; Disp. Date: 02/15/2018; Pty Chrg Dsp: Adjudicated Withheld; Misc. Sentencing Option: NOT APPLICABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISDEMEANOR WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO ENTER PLEA AND WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF INFORMATION SHOWING CASE NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketIssue Date: 12/21/2017; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; LEDGER, HEATHER MARIE; 3418 NW 37TH AVE 3454; GAINESVILLE, FL 32605; Tracking No: L000065701; ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 12/21/2017; Final Decision Date: 12/21/2017; Final Action: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 12/21/2017; Final Action: No Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking # L000065701; Failure Date: 01/17/2018; Result of Service: SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $276.00; Total Fee Paid: $276.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT; (CORRECT DOB VERIFIED THROUGH DMV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less