This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 19:30:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LEAP, KEVIN JOHN

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEAP, KEVIN JOHN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, WALTER M and COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************29 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, WALTER M

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEAP, KEVIN JOHN

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

08/20/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

08/06/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ADULT DRUG COURT//GREEN

08/06/2021: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ADULT DRUG COURT//GREEN

CONSENT TO DRUG COURT PROTOCOL OF SANCTIONS

08/06/2021: CONSENT TO DRUG COURT PROTOCOL OF SANCTIONS

DRUG COURT COVENANT AND AGREEMENT

08/06/2021: DRUG COURT COVENANT AND AGREEMENT

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - DUPLICATE

08/03/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - DUPLICATE

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

07/30/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

FAX COVER SHEET

07/29/2021: FAX COVER SHEET

ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

07/29/2021: ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

07/29/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

07/23/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

INFORMATION FILED

07/23/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

07/20/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/19/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

07/15/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

07/14/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

ARREST FORM

07/14/2021: ARREST FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Drug Court Hearing ; Date: 09/10/2021 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • ChargeDRUG EQUIP-POSSESS: AND OR USE; Charge: 2; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketOBTS POST-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; POST SENTENCE PHASE; Date Reopened: 08/06/2021; Reason Reopened: In Drug Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Drug Court Hearing ; Date: 08/20/2021 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 07/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $100.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKENS, KRISTIN S