This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 06:34:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- LANIER, JACKIE RAY

Case Summary

On 06/05/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LANIER, JACKIE RAY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************92 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

LANIER, JACKIE RAY

Gainesville, FL 32608

LANIER, JACK

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

CHIN, ASHLEY

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CHIN, ASHLEY

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/17/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/07/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/06/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/06/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2021 MM 001423 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 07/20/2021; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • ChargeINDECENT EXPOSURE: EXPOSURE OF SEXUAL ORGANS; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: ON OFFICER FIREFIGHTER EMT ETC; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIN, ASHLEY