This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 05:47:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- KRAUCH, NICKLAUS ROLAND

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KRAUCH, NICKLAUS ROLAND. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************76 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

KRAUCH, NICKLAUS ROLAND

Archer, FL 32618

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLINE, SHANNON MATHIS

Gainesville, FL 32627

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS, DEBORAH A

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

07/06/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

07/01/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/11/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

06/07/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/04/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/04/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/04/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/04/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/04/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: PRIOR CONVIC FELON BATT COMMIT 2ND SUB BA; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $1,000.00; Power Number: 2021AA025948; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 07/01/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA025948 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: BATTERY: PRIOR CONVIC FELON BATT COMMIT 2ND SUB BA ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 07/01/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/04/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/06/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA025948 ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $1,000.00; Power Number: 2021AA025948; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE