Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 16:04:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- KIRKSEY, XAVIER TYRONE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIRKSEY, XAVIER TYRONE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************14 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

KIRKSEY, XAVIER TYRONE

Gainesville, FL 32601

KIRTSEY, XAVIER

Gainesville, FL 32601

KIRKSEI, XAVIER TYRON

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION II

Gainesville, FL 32601

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

Gainesville, FL 32602

FOLSTON JR, ERNEST

Macclenny, FL 32063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DANNE, JOY L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

COUNSEL, REGIONAL

235 South Main St., Suite 205

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION II

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL//PENA

03/25/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL//PENA

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

03/15/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/15/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/15/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/15/2021: SURETY BOND

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

03/10/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/10/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/08/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/06/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/06/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/06/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL//PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/06/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/12/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSC50885112 ; Bond Amount: $50000 ; Bonding Co.: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/06/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 4 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/12/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSC5885093 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/06/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/12/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSC75885114 ; Bond Amount: $50000 ; Bonding Co.: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/06/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/12/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSC105885117 ; Bond Amount: $75000 ; Bonding Co.: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: PSC75885114; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC.; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $75,000.00; Power Number: PSC105885117; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC.; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E