Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 16:32:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- KIRKSEY JR, TYRONE DETRON

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIRKSEY JR, TYRONE DETRON. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************03 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

KIRKSEY JR, TYRONE DETRON

Gainesville, FL 32641

CURTIS, TYRONE DETRON

Gainesville, FL 32641

KIRKSEY, TYRONE DETRON

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION II

Gainesville, FL 32601

REAVES, JOEY

Gainesville, FL 32641

CHANG, RICH

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HADDAD, LINDA E

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION II

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

CHANG, RICH

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

03/05/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

03/04/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/02/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/01/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

SURETY BOND

02/26/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/26/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

02/25/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/25/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

02/25/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • ChargeCOCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: 2021AA008656; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 03/04/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA008656 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: COCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 03/04/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 02/24/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 02/25/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA008656 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: 2021AA008656; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less