Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/29/2021 at 16:03:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- KELLEY, JATYVIN KAVID

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KELLEY, JATYVIN KAVID. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************76 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

KELLEY, JATYVIN KAVID

Butler, GA 31006

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY GUN

Gainesville, FL 32601

CHANG, RICH

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCLOUD, TONETTE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCDONALD ESQ, ALISHIA W

309 Ne 1St St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY GUN

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

CHANG, RICH

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

04/27/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

04/27/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

SURETY BOND

04/26/2021: SURETY BOND

AMENDED COURT ACTION MEMO / NUNC PRO TUNC 04212021

04/23/2021: AMENDED COURT ACTION MEMO / NUNC PRO TUNC 04212021

ORDER REDUCING BOND

04/22/2021: ORDER REDUCING BOND

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/21/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

INFORMATION FILED

04/20/2021: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

04/20/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/19/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/06/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/05/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ARREST FORM

04/02/2021: ARREST FORM

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/02/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/01/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: POSSESSION OF WEAPON: OR AMMO BY CONVICTED FLA FEL ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/24/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE50932802 ; Bond Amount: $50000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: PSE50932802; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COURT ACTION MEMO / NUNC PRO TUNC 04212021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REDUCING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 04/20/2021; Final Decision Date: 04/20/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 04/21/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 2 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less