This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:50:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- JONES, LUCAS ALAN

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES, LUCAS ALAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************96 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

JONES, LUCAS ALAN

Mcintosh, FL 32664

Not Yet Classified

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

Gainesville, FL 32602

THOMAS, SEAN R

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PELZMAN ESQ, RENEE R

Po Box 770172

Ocala, FL 34477

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR COSTS

08/06/2021: MOTION FOR COSTS

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

07/30/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/29/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

07/28/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

INFORMATION FILED

07/23/2021: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/22/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

07/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/29/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

06/28/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

06/28/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

06/28/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

06/28/2021: SURETY BOND

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/24/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/24/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/24/2021: ARREST FORM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 4; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: U2521089996; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: U5021051963; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 09/08/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 2 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 08/18/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 2 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-D; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/23/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/24/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: U15021060255 ; Bond Amount: $75000 ; Bonding Co.: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 4; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: U2521089996; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 3; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: U2521076060; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: U5021051963; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $75,000.00; Power Number: U15021060255; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: THOMAS BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E