This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:33:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- JONES, DANIEL LAWAYNE

Case Summary

On 06/20/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES, DANIEL LAWAYNE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************70 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

JONES, DANIEL LAWAYNE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS, DEBORAH A

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/29/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

07/28/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/20/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/14/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

07/14/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/29/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/21/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/21/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 09/08/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 2 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 08/04/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 2 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-D; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • ChargeSMUGGLE CONTRABAND: CTRL SUB s.893.02(4) COUNTY DE; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 07/14/2021; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 07/14/2021; Final Decision Date: 07/14/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E