This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 07:19:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- JONES, AARON DANIEL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES, AARON DANIEL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************98 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

JONES, AARON DANIEL

Gainesville, FL 32606

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS, DEBORAH A

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

RELEASE BOND/CHECK REQUEST

06/30/2021: RELEASE BOND/CHECK REQUEST

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

06/29/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

CASH APPEARANCE BOND-ADDRESS COULD NOT BE UPDATED PER CASH BOND, ADDRESS INCOMPLETE//HAP

06/11/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND-ADDRESS COULD NOT BE UPDATED PER CASH BOND, ADDRESS INCOMPLETE//HAP

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/07/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/07/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/07/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/07/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/07/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT CRIMINAL OPEN BOND # 210607CF1698A1; Amount: $2,500.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE BOND/CHECK REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: PRIOR CONVIC FELON BATT COMMIT 2ND SUB BA; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 210607CF1698A1; Bond Status: Released; Cash Depositor: JONES, AARON DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 06/29/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 210607CF1698A1 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: BATTERY: PRIOR CONVIC FELON BATT COMMIT 2ND SUB BA ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: ; Bond Amount: $2500 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 06/29/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 210607CF1698A1; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: JONES, AARON DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 226274; Paid: $2,500.00; Applied: $2,500.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/06/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: CASH BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/11/2021 ; Bond Type: CASH BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 210607CF1698A1 ; Bond Amount: $2500 ; Bonding Co.: ; Cash Depositor: JONES, AARON DANIEL ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $2,550.00; Total Fee Paid: $2,500.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C