Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 16:06:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HOWELL, DETRON SAMUEL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOWELL, DETRON SAMUEL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************43 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

HOWELL, DETRON SAMUEL

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HADDAD, LINDA E

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROTHENBERG, DEBORAH E

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL VICTIM PROTECTION REQUEST

03/24/2021: CRIMINAL VICTIM PROTECTION REQUEST

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/12/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/11/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/11/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/11/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL VICTIM PROTECTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HADDAD, LINDA E