Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:27:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HOWARD SR, LADANIEL CORNELIAS

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOWARD SR, LADANIEL CORNELIAS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************02 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

HOWARD SR, LADANIEL CORNELIAS

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

GRIPPIN, MADELINE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CIANCI, DAVID R

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GRIPPIN, MADELINE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/04/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

02/26/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/25/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

02/25/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

02/25/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIPPIN, MADELINE