Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 22:04:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HOLLIMAN, KRISTI D

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOLLIMAN, KRISTI D. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************82 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendants

HOLLIMAN, KRISTI D

Gainesville, FL 32609

HERNANDEZ, JENNIFER

Gainesville, FL 32609

HOLLIMAN, KRISTI DIANN

Gainesville, FL 32609

HOLIMAN, KRISTI D

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HADDAD, LINDA E

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL: UNCLAIMED

11/20/2017: RETURNED MAIL: UNCLAIMED

CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

10/12/2017: CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

CIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

10/12/2017: CIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS (NUNC PRO TUNC 09272017) // COLAW

10/09/2017: AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS (NUNC PRO TUNC 09272017) // COLAW

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // COLAW

09/27/2017: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // COLAW

FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

09/27/2017: FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

09/27/2017: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

SCORE SHEET

09/27/2017: SCORE SHEET

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

09/20/2017: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/27/2017: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/25/2017: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

06/28/2017: ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/28/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/23/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

06/22/2017: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

06/20/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/20/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST FORM

06/20/2017: ARREST FORM

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2018
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS (NUNC PRO TUNC 09272017) // COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SENTENCE DOCUMENT (NUNC PRO TUNC 09272017) // COLAW - DOCUMENT ENTRY TO WRONG CASE. DOCUMENT ADDED TO CORRECT CASE NO. 2017-CF-002283-A /RB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO TO JUDGE COLAW FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • HearingChange of Plea; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLUGH, STEPHANIE B