This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/13/2023 at 01:42:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HINES, GORDON GREGORY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HINES, GORDON GREGORY. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************80 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendants

HINES, GORDON GREGORY

Gainesville, FL 32609

ADDL DOB

ADDL SSN

HINES, GORDON MICHAEL

GIGOLO

HINES, GORDON GREG

Not Yet Classified

RAMIREZ, CELESTE

Gainesville, FL 32601

BRYANT, MARCIA

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, CALEB

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMIREZ, CELESTE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ARREST FORM

01/24/2023: ARREST FORM

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/24/2023: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/24/2023: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

01/25/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

SURETY BOND

01/26/2023: SURETY BOND

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/27/2023: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

03/10/2023: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $1,000.00; Power Number: PSE51047940; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: PSE51047940 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: DOMESTIC BATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: BATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 03/10/2023 ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 03/10/2023; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/23/2023 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/25/2023 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE51047940 ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $1,000.00; Power Number: PSE51047940; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketASSESSMENT - MM $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less