This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/28/2023 at 21:10:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HILL, ANTOINE J

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HILL, ANTOINE J. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************49 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant

HILL, ANTOINE J

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

RAMIREZ, CELESTE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMIREZ, CELESTE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

11/17/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Summons Issued (Do not delete)

12/06/2022: Summons Issued (Do not delete)

PETITION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

12/14/2022: PETITION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

12/14/2022: ORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

PROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

12/14/2022: PROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

12/22/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

HEARING NOTES

01/04/2023: HEARING NOTES

ORDER WITHDRAWING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/MILLER-JONES; RE: CONTEMNOR WHITNEY RENA JACKSON

01/04/2023: ORDER WITHDRAWING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/MILLER-JONES; RE: CONTEMNOR WHITNEY RENA JACKSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/MILLER-JONES; RE: CONTEMNOR WHITNEY RENA JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • ChargeDOMESTIC BATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketIssue Date: 12/05/2022; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; HILL, ANTOINE J; 3055 NE 28TH DR; GAINESVILLE, FL 32609; Tracking No: L000070729; ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 12/05/2022; Final Decision Date: 12/05/2022; Final Action: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking #: L000070729

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMIREZ, CELESTE