This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 21:23:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HARVEY, NICHOLAS JERMAINE

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARVEY, NICHOLAS JERMAINE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************30 C

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

HARVEY, NICHOLAS JERMAINE

Miami Gardens, FL 33055

Not Yet Classified

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WEISMAN ESQ, DANIEL A

3312 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLEA / PENA

10/17/2019: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLEA / PENA

SENTENCE DOCUMENT; E-filed to DOC on 10/17/2019// cmg

10/11/2019: SENTENCE DOCUMENT; E-filed to DOC on 10/17/2019// cmg

CIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

10/02/2019: CIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // NILON

09/25/2019: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // NILON

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/14/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

06/17/2019: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/14/2019: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ORDER REMOVING NEBBIA HOLD (AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REDUCE BOND) // PENA

04/24/2019: ORDER REMOVING NEBBIA HOLD (AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REDUCE BOND) // PENA

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/11/2019: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

03/15/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

COURT ACTION MEMO

02/19/2019: COURT ACTION MEMO

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/19/2019: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // Pena

01/29/2019: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // Pena

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/07/2019: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

01/03/2019: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

11/27/2018: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

11/27/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SCORE SHEET (NUNC PRO TUNC (NUNC PRO TUNC 09252019)// NILON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT (NUNC PRO TUNC 09252019)// NILON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO TO JUDGE NILON FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT VERIFICATION FORM; E-filed to DOC on 10/30/2019// cmg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLEA / PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT, REDUCE OR MODIFY SENTENCE //NILON; E-filed to DOC on 10/17/2019// cmg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW PLEA; E-filed to DOC on 10/17/2019// cmg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOBTS POST-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2, 3, 4; POST SENTENCE PHASE; Date Reopened: 10/15/2019; Reason Reopened: M/Withdraw Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PRODUCTION AND DISCLOSURE OF SOURCE OF BAIL PREMIUM AND COLLATERAL PRIOR TO DEFENDANT'S RELEASE ON BAIL "NEBBIA HEARING"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $621.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $621.00

    Read MoreRead Less