Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:41:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- HARRINGTON JR, NATHAIL EUGENE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRINGTON JR, NATHAIL EUGENE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************57 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

HARRINGTON JR, NATHAIL EUGENE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

CHANG, RICH

Gainesville, FL 32601

SANDERS, JEREMY

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, LUIS D

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CHANG, RICH

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

01/21/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

SURETY BOND

01/29/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

01/29/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

01/29/2020: SURETY BOND

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

01/22/2020: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

01/21/2020: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

ARREST FORM

01/05/2020: ARREST FORM

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AB6NHME

01/05/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AB6NHME

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/05/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

COURT ACTION MEMO

01/22/2020: COURT ACTION MEMO

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/09/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

INFORMATION FILED

01/21/2020: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

01/24/2020: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/21/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

01/07/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/05/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: 3 ; Prosecutor Action Code: OPERATE MOTOR VEHICLE WO VALID LICENSE ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/28/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5132584 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: NORTH CENTRAL FLORIDA BAIL BONDS LLC ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/05/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: 2 ; Prosecutor Action Code: DRUG EQUIP-POSSESS: AND OR USE ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/28/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5132572 ; Bond Amount: $2500 ; Bonding Co.: NORTH CENTRAL FLORIDA BAIL BONDS LLC ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/05/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: COCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/28/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5132569 ; Bond Amount: $2500 ; Bonding Co.: NORTH CENTRAL FLORIDA BAIL BONDS LLC ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 3; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: PSE5132584; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: NORTH CENTRAL FLORIDA BAIL BONDS LLC; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: PSE5132572; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: NORTH CENTRAL FLORIDA BAIL BONDS LLC; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: PSE5132569; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: NORTH CENTRAL FLORIDA BAIL BONDS LLC; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AB6NHME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less