Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 19:49:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- GREEN, VINCENT DWIGHT

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GREEN, VINCENT DWIGHT. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************43 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

GREEN, VINCENT DWIGHT

Live Oak, FL 32060

Not Yet Classified

CHANG, RICH

Gainesville, FL 32601

BEAGLE, BRIAN

Starke, FL 32091

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CHANG, RICH

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

04/23/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO JESSICA MAE MYERS// COLAW

04/18/2018: CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO JESSICA MAE MYERS// COLAW

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // COLAW

04/18/2018: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // COLAW

FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT

04/18/2018: FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT

SCORE SHEET

04/18/2018: SCORE SHEET

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT // COLAW

04/18/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT // COLAW

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

04/02/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

03/21/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

PROCESSED TRANSPORT ORDER

03/20/2018: PROCESSED TRANSPORT ORDER

AMENDED ORDER TO TRANSPORT TO CORRECT DATE OF HEARING//COLAW

03/19/2018: AMENDED ORDER TO TRANSPORT TO CORRECT DATE OF HEARING//COLAW

PROCESSED TRANSPORT ORDER

03/15/2018: PROCESSED TRANSPORT ORDER

ORDER TO TRANSPORT

03/14/2018: ORDER TO TRANSPORT

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

02/14/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

SURETY BOND

02/12/2018: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

02/12/2018: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/07/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

02/07/2018: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/07/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVIOLATION REPORT - REQUEST FOR WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - VIOLATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOBTS POST-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 3; POST SENTENCE PHASE; Date Reopened: 05/22/2019; Reason Reopened: Violation of Probation/Community Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • BondCharge Number: 3; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Power Number: AC17078193; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: ABSOLUTE BAIL BONDS - STARKE; Insurance Company: ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $15,000.00; Power Number: AB17121352; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: ABSOLUTE BAIL BONDS - STARKE; Insurance Company: ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: AB17121352 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: FRAUD: FALSE OWNER INFO PAWN ITEMS LESS THAN 300 D ; Prosecutor Count #: 2 ; Prosecutor Action Code: FRAUD: FALSE OWNER INFO PAWN ITEMS LESS THAN 300 D ; Bonding Co.: ABSOLUTE BAIL BONDS - STARKE ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 2 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 04/20/2018 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: AC17078193 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: STOLEN PROP DEAL IN ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: STOLEN PROP DEAL IN ; Bonding Co.: ABSOLUTE BAIL BONDS - STARKE ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 04/20/2018 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • ChargeFRAUD: FALSE OWNER INFO PAWN ITEMS LESS THAN 300 D; Charge: 2; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketALERT SERVED; Capias served on: 02/06/2018 for: GREEN, VINCENT DWIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • ChargeSTOLEN PROP DEAL IN; Charge: 4; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • ChargeFRAUD: FALSE OWNER INFO PAWN ITEMS LESS THAN 300 D; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2, 4; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 12/11/2017; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 3; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 12/08/2017; Final Decision Date: 12/08/2017; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $921.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $921.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less