Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:03:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- GRANT SR, KEITH

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRANT SR, KEITH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************08 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

GRANT SR, KEITH

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

GRIPPIN, MADELINE

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, MELISSA

Orlando, FL 32839

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RAMSEY JR ESQ, JOHN A

537 Ne 1St Street, Suite 3

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GRIPPIN, MADELINE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM (DUPLICATE)

04/30/2021: OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM (DUPLICATE)

SURETY BOND

04/27/2021: SURETY BOND

OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

04/27/2021: OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/22/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

OUT OF COUNTY BOND OUT INFORMATION - FILED BY ASO

04/19/2021: OUT OF COUNTY BOND OUT INFORMATION - FILED BY ASO

NOTICE OF FILING

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

04/13/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

04/13/2021: PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/13/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

04/13/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

Bench Warrant Issued

04/12/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

04/12/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/13/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/13/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: U5021102723 ; Bond Amount: $50000 ; Bonding Co.: MONCRIEF BAIL BONDS, INC. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUT OF COUNTY BOND OUT INFORMATION - FILED BY ASO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: U5021102723; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: MONCRIEF BAIL BONDS, INC.; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 04/13/2021 for: GRANT SR, KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 04/12/2021 ; For: GRANT SR, KEITH ; Bond Amt: 50000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY JR ESQ, JOHN A