This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 08:38:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- FRANKLIN JR, ROOSEVELT

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FRANKLIN JR, ROOSEVELT. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************31 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

FRANKLIN JR, ROOSEVELT

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/22/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketALERT CANCELLED; BENCH WARRANT canceled on: 08/03/2021 ; For: FRANKLIN JR, ROOSEVELT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE