This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 07:18:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- FAIRLEY, JAMAINE DAVONTA

Case Summary

On 06/06/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FAIRLEY, JAMAINE DAVONTA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PENA, PHILLIP A and KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************97 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PENA, PHILLIP A

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendants

FAIRLEY, JAMAINE DAVONTA

Gainesville, FL 32641

FARLEY, JAMAINE DAVONTE

Gainesville, FL 32641

FAIRLEY, JAMAINE DEVONTE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PHILLIPS, DEBORAH A

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

STACY, HOLLY R

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

08/12/2021: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

07/29/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/19/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

COURT ACTION MEMO

07/15/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

ALACHUA COUNTY FDLE FIREARM REPORT - MENTAL HEALTH ORDERS

07/06/2021: ALACHUA COUNTY FDLE FIREARM REPORT - MENTAL HEALTH ORDERS

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/02/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

PROCESSED COMMITMENT ORDER TO AGENCY FOR PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES [INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY/AUTISM]

07/02/2021: PROCESSED COMMITMENT ORDER TO AGENCY FOR PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES [INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY/AUTISM]

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

07/02/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

ORDER ADJUDGING DEFENDANT INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED AND COMMITMENT TO APD [INTELLECTUAL DISABLTY/AUTSM]

07/01/2021: ORDER ADJUDGING DEFENDANT INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED AND COMMITMENT TO APD [INTELLECTUAL DISABLTY/AUTSM]

DEFENDANT UNABLE TO SIGN NOTICE

07/01/2021: DEFENDANT UNABLE TO SIGN NOTICE

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO FELONY DIVISION V AND SEALING CONFIDENTIAL EVALUATION

06/21/2021: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO FELONY DIVISION V AND SEALING CONFIDENTIAL EVALUATION

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

06/16/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

06/10/2021: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/08/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/07/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/07/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/07/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingFELONY FORENSICS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingFELONY FORENSICS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingFELONY FORENSICS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: FELONY FORENSICS ; Date: 08/12/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 5 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: FELONY FORENSICS ; Date: 07/29/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 5 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 06/10/2021; Final Decision Date: 06/10/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKENS, KRISTIN S