This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/19/2021 at 07:02:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- FAIR, WHITNEY ALENE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FAIR, WHITNEY ALENE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************85 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

FAIR, WHITNEY A

Gainesville, FL 32609

FAIR, WHITNEY ALENE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MEANS, YOLANDA

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

05/14/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

05/13/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/03/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/03/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

CHANGE OF ADDRESS FROM DEFENDANT

04/29/2021: CHANGE OF ADDRESS FROM DEFENDANT

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

04/29/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/28/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/28/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/28/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC); Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/13/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHANGE OF ADDRESS FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE