Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 00:19:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- EVANS, JONATHAN

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EVANS, JONATHAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************42 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

EVANS, JONATHAN

Starke, FL 32091

Not Yet Classified

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

10/03/2018: CIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION// PENA

09/25/2018: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION// PENA

FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

09/25/2018: FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED (VOP) //PENA

09/25/2018: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED (VOP) //PENA

COURT ACTION MEMO

09/25/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

COURT ACTION MEMO

09/20/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/23/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

VOP Warrant Issued

07/09/2018: VOP Warrant Issued

AMENDED AFFIDAVIT-VIOLATION OF PROBATION

07/09/2018: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT-VIOLATION OF PROBATION

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/14/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

DELINQUENCY NOTICE ISSUED - CF - DELINQUENCY FEE ASSESSED ; Charge #1: FLEE/ELUDE POLICE: FLEE W DISREGARD OF SAFETY TO P; Amount: $25.00; Amount Due: $25.00

05/18/2018: DELINQUENCY NOTICE ISSUED - CF - DELINQUENCY FEE ASSESSED ; Charge #1: FLEE/ELUDE POLICE: FLEE W DISREGARD OF SAFETY TO P; Amount: $25.00; Amount Due: $25.00

Traffic VOP Warrant Issued (Do not delete)

05/17/2018: Traffic VOP Warrant Issued (Do not delete)

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // PENA

10/25/2017: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // PENA

FELONY WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

10/25/2017: FELONY WITHHELD - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED// PENA

10/25/2017: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED// PENA

COURT ACTION MEMO

10/25/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

10/17/2017: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

08/07/2017: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $976.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • HearingVOP Hearing; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $976.00 SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//JMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • HearingChange of Plea; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • ChargeFLEE/ELUDE POLICE: FLEE W DISREGARD OF SAFETY TO P; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF ATTORNEY FEES; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $976.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $976.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A0K391P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME