Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:02:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- EASON, DELVIS TYRONE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EASON, DELVIS TYRONE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************07 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

EASON, DELVIS TYRONE

Palatka, FL 32177

EASTON, DELVIS TYRONE

Palatka, FL 32177

Not Yet Classified

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RUSH ESQ, ROBERT A

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 11 Se 2 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

04/28/2021: OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

04/26/2021: PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/22/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/22/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/22/2021: ARREST FORM

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/22/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Bench Warrant Issued

04/12/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

04/12/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 04/21/2021 for: EASON, DELVIS TYRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 04/12/2021 ; For: EASON, DELVIS TYRONE ; Bond Amt: 100000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S