This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:18:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DUNCAN, TAURUS CORDARRYL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUNCAN, TAURUS CORDARRYL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************61 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

DUNCAN, TAURUS CORDARRYL

Gainesville, FL 32608

DUNCAN, TARUS

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

BAKER, TYRONE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GLEASON ESQ, CATHERINE H.Y.

912 Nw 56Th Terr, Suite A

Gainesville, FL 32605

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

06/21/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

06/21/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

06/21/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

06/21/2021: SURETY BOND

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/19/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/19/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/19/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/19/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 4 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/20/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021DD002664 ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/19/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/20/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021DD002663 ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/19/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/20/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 20021DD002662 ; Bond Amount: $50000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/19/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/20/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021DD002661 ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 4; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Power Number: 2021DD002664; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 3; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $15,000.00; Power Number: 2021DD002663; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: 20021DD002662; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Power Number: 2021DD002661; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C