Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 15:14:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DUNCAN, GLENSON LAMAR

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUNCAN, GLENSON LAMAR. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************21 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

DUNCAN, GLENSON LAMAR

Gainesville, FL 32609

DUNKAN, GLENSON LAMAR

Gainesville, FL 32609

DUCAN, GLENSON LAMAR

Gainesville, FL 32609

RED

3055 Ne 28Th Dr

Gainesville, FL 32609

GLENSON

3055 Ne 28Th Dr

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

04/20/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

04/07/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/06/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/06/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/06/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/06/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Red Corporation is a litigant