Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 13:51:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DREYFUSS, PAIGE MAXINE

Case Summary

On 10/01/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DREYFUSS, PAIGE MAXINE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************88 A

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendants

DREYFUSS, PAIGE MAXINE

Archer, FL 32618

JONES, PAIGE MAXINE

Archer, FL 32618

Not Yet Classified

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

10/25/2017: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

10/24/2017: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

10/13/2017: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

10/12/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER REDUCING BOND // PENA

10/10/2017: ORDER REDUCING BOND // PENA

COURT ACTION MEMO

10/10/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

10/09/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/09/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

10/09/2017: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

10/01/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

10/01/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

10/01/2017: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • ChargeROBBERY: WITH WEAPON; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO INFO UNABLE TO LOCATE VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 10/25/2017; Final Action: A1 NO INFO UNABLE TO LOCATE VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REDUCING BOND // PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 10/10/2017 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY, JONATHAN D