This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/25/2021 at 07:37:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DRAWDY, SARAH JANE MARJORYE

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DRAWDY, SARAH JANE MARJORYE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************95 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

DRAWDY, SARAH JANE MARJORYE

Melrose, FL 32666

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

PRINCE, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GARDINER, EVAN M

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

PRINCE, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

07/26/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE

07/22/2021: ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

07/22/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

06/22/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/22/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

06/18/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/18/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/18/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/15/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/15/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/15/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/15/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/15/2021: ARREST FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 06/22/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE, BRITANEE