This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:30:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DOWNER, VANESSA

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DOWNER, VANESSA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************83 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOWNER, VANESSA

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLARK, VANESSA

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

PRINCE, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GARDINER, EVAN M

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

PRINCE, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

07/28/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

05/28/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

PROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

05/25/2021: PROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

ORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

05/25/2021: ORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

PETITION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

05/24/2021: PETITION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

05/21/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // KREIDER

05/20/2021: ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // KREIDER

MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 3.134 FRCrP

05/20/2021: MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 3.134 FRCrP

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // KREIDER

04/20/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // KREIDER

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/20/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/16/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/13/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/12/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/11/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ARREST FORM

04/11/2021: ARREST FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • ChargeAGGRAV ASSLT-W DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KIL; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 07/28/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROCESSED SHOW CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // KREIDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 3.134 FRCrP

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 04/20/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE