This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 05:47:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DOMINGUEZ-FERNANDEZ, FELIPE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ-FERNANDEZ, FELIPE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************85 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOMINGUEZ-FERNANDEZ, FELIPE

Gainesville, FL 32608

DOMINGUEZ, FELIPE

Gainesville, FL 32608

FERNANDEZ, FELIPE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

CORNWELL, CINDY

Chiefland, FL 32626

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

BROLING, JOHN L

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

08/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

08/16/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

08/16/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/13/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

08/10/2021: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/10/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

08/05/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/26/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

07/16/2021: INFORMATION FILED

SURETY BOND

06/21/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/17/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/17/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/17/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/17/2021: ARREST FORM

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Bench Warrant Issued

06/04/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

06/04/2021: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

06/04/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 09/14/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 06/16/2021 for: DOMINGUEZ-FERNANDEZ, FELIPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 06/04/2021 ; For: DOMINGUEZ-FERNANDEZ, FELIPE ; Bond Amt: 25000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C