Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:35:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DIMAS, ANTHONY ROBERT

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DIMAS, ANTHONY ROBERT. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************93 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

DIMAS, ANTHONY ROBERT

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLINE, SHANNON MATHIS

Gainesville, FL 32627

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND

03/10/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/10/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/10/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/10/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/10/2021: SURETY BOND

ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // KREIDER

03/09/2021: ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // KREIDER

COURT ACTION MEMO

03/09/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

03/04/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/04/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/02/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/24/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

02/24/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

02/24/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/24/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

02/24/2021: ARREST FORM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 02/23/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 5 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/09/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA008681 ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 02/23/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 4 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/09/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA009140 ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 02/23/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/09/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021AA009139 ; Bond Amount: $1000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 02/23/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/09/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021DD002652 ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 02/23/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/09/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021DD002651 ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; Bonding Co.: MATHIS BAIL BONDS AGENCY ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE