This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 10/11/2021 at 16:03:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DICKSON, DANIEL JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DICKSON, DANIEL JOSEPH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************13 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

DICKSON, DANIEL JOSEPH

Gainesville, FL 32653

Not Yet Classified

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

Wellington, FL 33414

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HUTSON ESQ, BENNETT

2750 Nw 43Rd Street Ste 102

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

10/01/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

ORDER ACCEPTING WAIVER OF SURETY AND SETTING CASH-ONLY BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS INCLUDING GPS MONITORING // KREIDER

09/28/2021: ORDER ACCEPTING WAIVER OF SURETY AND SETTING CASH-ONLY BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS INCLUDING GPS MONITORING // KREIDER

COURT ACTION MEMO

09/28/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/23/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

09/23/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

09/17/2021: PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

09/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

09/13/2021: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 14; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A14; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 13; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A13; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 12; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A12; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 11; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A11; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 10; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A10; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 9; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A9; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 8; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A8; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 7; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A7; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 6; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A6; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 5; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: 21928CF002813A5; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: ROSENBLUM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 09/19/2021 for: DICKSON, DANIEL JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $35,000.00; Total Fee Paid: $35,000.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 09/13/2021 ; For: DICKSON, DANIEL JOSEPH ; Bond Amt: 350000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C