This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 16:14:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DE LA CRUZ GONZALEZ, BRYAN EMIL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DE LA CRUZ GONZALEZ, BRYAN EMIL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************41 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

DE LA CRUZ GONZALEZ, BRYAN EMIL

Gainesville, FL 32607

DELACRUZ, BRYAN EMIL

Gainesville, FL 32607

DELACRUZ, BRIAN

Gainesville, FL 32607

GONZALEZ, BRYAN EMIL

Gainesville, FL 32607

DELACRUZGONZALEZ, BRYAN EMIL

Gainesville, FL 32607

DELACRUZGONZ, BRYANEMIL

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

JAMES, ANTHONY L

Macclenny, FL 32063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

06/23/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

06/18/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/05/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

04/05/2021: SURETY BOND

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/23/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/23/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/23/2021: ARREST FORM

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: COMMIT DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: PSC751229591; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC.; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 06/18/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: PSC751229591 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: BATTERY: COMMIT DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC. ; Bond Amount: $20000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 06/18/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/22/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/03/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSC751229591 ; Bond Amount: $20000 ; Bonding Co.: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC. ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: PSC751229591; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: AAA HELP BAIL BONDING, INC.; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C