Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:00:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DAVIS, TAYAH CORIN

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, TAYAH CORIN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************96 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAVIS, TAYAH CORIN

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

BECKER, MICHAEL L

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FLYNN, CONOR P

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BECKER, MICHAEL L

Assistant State Attorney, 120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/04/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

05/04/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/03/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

05/02/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

05/02/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

05/02/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

05/02/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

Bench Warrant Issued

04/12/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

04/12/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/19/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 05/11/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 05/01/2021 for: DAVIS, TAYAH CORIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 04/12/2021 ; For: DAVIS, TAYAH CORIN ; Bond Amt: 170000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER MICHAEL L. LAW OFFICES OF