Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:29:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DAVIS, GARRICK LEE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, GARRICK LEE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************00 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendants

DAVIS, GARRICK LEE

Gainesville, FL 32606

DAVIS, GARRICK L

Gainesville, FL 32606

DAVIS, GARRICK

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

03/22/2021: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

03/22/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

03/09/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

COURT ACTION MEMO

03/09/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/02/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

03/02/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/02/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

02/25/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/25/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/25/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AD3J66E

02/25/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AD3J66E

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AD3J65E

02/25/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AD3J65E

ARREST FORM

02/25/2021: ARREST FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 03/09/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AD3J66E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AD3J65E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S